EP3702884 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING FOR THERMAL MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rush, Brian Magann 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Gerstler, William Dwight 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Lassini, Stefano Angelo Mario 3290 Patterson Avenue Grand Rapids, MI 49512 / US | 04 /
Wetzel, Todd Garrett 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 20163552.1 | 07.04.2015 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | US201461976649P | 08.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461976649 P | US201514592387 | 08.01.2015 Original published format: US201514592387 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702884 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3702884 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20, H05K7/20, F28D15/02, F28D15/04, B22F3/11, B22F10/20, B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H05K7/20336 (EP,US);
B22F10/20 (EP);
B22F3/1103 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
F28D15/0233 (EP,US);
F28D15/046 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (EP,US);
H05K7/20672 (EP,US);
G06F2200/201 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | G06F1/20, H05K7/20, F28D15/02, F28D15/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON GENERATIVER HERSTELLUNG ZUR WÄRMEVERWALTUNG | [2020/36] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING FOR THERMAL MANAGEMENT | [2020/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE POUR LA GESTION THERMIQUE | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 19.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2023 | 01.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15162670.2 / EP2930587 | Divisional application(s) | EP24166693.2 / EP4368395 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6269866 (YAMAMOTO MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2002021556 (DIBENE JOSEPH T [US], et al); | [A]US2009040726 (HOFFMAN PAUL [US], et al); | [I]WO2009120613 (RAYTHEON CO [US], et al); | [A]US7848624 (ZIMBECK WALTER R [US], et al); | [I]DE102011086786 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) |