EP3882888 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AIR TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kilpert, Joerg c/o Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstraße 15 81671 München / DE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 20163644.6 | 17.03.2020 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882888 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR LUFTVERKEHRSSTEUERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON LUFTVERKEHR | [2021/38] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AIR TRAFFIC | [2021/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION POUR LE CONTRÔLE DE TRAFIC AÉRIEN ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DU TRAFIC AÉRIEN | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006046715 (BURGEMEISTER ALVIN H [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 58] , [0 62] *; | [A]US2010198489 (ROZOVSKI DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP3444791 (IATAS AUTOMATIC AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL LTD [IL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]US7313143 (BRUNO RONALD [US]) [Y] 6-9,14,15 * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 52 * * figures 1, 4, 13 *; | [A]US8219799 (LUCCHESI FRANK A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 16, line 58 - line 64 * * column 23, line 37 - column 24, line 39 * * figure 1 * | [XYI] - Anonymous, "Air traffic management research & innovation 2018 highlights", Luxembourg, doi:10.2829/40375, ISBN 978-92-9-216125-5, (20190315), URL: https://www.sesarju.eu/sites/default/files/documents/reports/SESAR%20Innovation%20pipeline%202018.PDF, (20200907), XP055728203 [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 9 * [Y] 6-9,14,15 [I] 3-5,10,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2829/40375 |