EP3712039 - IN-VEHICLE PROCESSING DEVICE AND MOVEMENT SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarion Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEJIMA, Noriyasu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
OGATA, Takehito c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
KUWAHARA, Toshihisa c/o Clarion Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 20164040.6 | 18.03.2020 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | JP20190052743 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019052743 | [2020/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712039 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
B62D15/0285 (EP,CN);
B60W30/06 (CN,US);
B60W40/105 (US);
B62D15/027 (EP,CN);
G01C21/20 (EP);
G01C21/28 (CN);
G01C21/32 (CN,US);
G01C21/3807 (EP);
G01C21/3848 (EP);
G01C21/3885 (EP);
G01S19/42 (CN);
B60W2400/00 (US);
B60W2554/20 (US);
B60W2556/10 (US);
B60W2556/40 (US);
B60W2556/50 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN-FAHRZEUG-VERARBEITUNGSGERÄT UND BEWEGUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/39] | English: | IN-VEHICLE PROCESSING DEVICE AND MOVEMENT SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DANS UN VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT DE MOUVEMENT | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017313306 (NORDBRUCH STEFAN [DE]); | [Y]US2017351267 (MIELENZ HOLGER [DE]); | [Y]EP3333049 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) |