EP3721767 - TISSUE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daio Paper Corporation 2-60 Mishimakamiya-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0492 / JP | For all designated states TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUI, Shuta OMIYASEISHI KABUSHIKIGAISHA 329 Nonaka-cho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-0038 / JP | 02 /
HIRATA, Norimitsu OMIYASEISHI KABUSHIKIGAISHA 329 Nonaka-cho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-0038 / JP | 03 /
YOROZU, Hidenori DAIO PAPER CORPORATION 2-10-2 Fujimi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 102-0071 / JP | 04 /
HOKKIRIGAWA, Kazuo TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGUCHI, Takeshi TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 06 /
SHIBATA, Kei TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 07 /
TANABE, Wataru TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 08 /
MATSUMURA, Shohei TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20164583.5 | 04.08.2016 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | JP20150180821 | 14.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015180821 | [2020/42] | Previously filed application, date | WO2016JP72949 | 04.08.2016 | [2020/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721767 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721767 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/16, D21H27/00 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A47K10/16 (EP,KR,US);
D21H27/005 (US);
D21H27/00 (EP,US);
D21H27/002 (KR);
D21H27/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TISSUEPAPIER | [2020/42] | English: | TISSUE PAPER | [2020/42] | French: | PAPIERS MINCES | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16846146.5 / EP3351153 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | AT | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | IT | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005124884 (DAIO SEISHI KK) [A] 1,2* the whole document * | by applicant | JP4450552B | JP4658056B | JP4875488B |