EP3758318 - SHARED MEMORY MESH FOR SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUTHWORTH, Robert 9306 Cima de Lago St. Chatsworth, California 91311 / US | 02 /
HUGGAHALLI, Ramakrishna 7539 E Pasaro Dr Scottsdale, Arizona 85266 / US | 03 /
DAMA, Jonathan 708 Long Bridge St., Apt 1108 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 04 /
NAEIMI, Helia 3500 Granada Ave., Apt 440 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 05 /
MCCORMICK, Jim 1131 White Oak Ct. Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | 06 /
PAPADANTONAKIS, Karl 28603 Acacia Glen Street Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US | 07 /
SRINIVASAN, Arvind 1075 Happy Valley Avenue San Jose, California 95129 / US | 08 /
PENARANDA CEBRIAN, Roberto 3600 Juliette Ln SC12-MS322 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20164686.6 | 20.03.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201962868730P | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962868730 P | US201916549915 | 23.08.2019 Original published format: US201916549915 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758318 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L49/25, H04L45/00, H04L49/351 | [2024/44] | CPC: |
H04L49/251 (EP);
H04L49/103 (US);
H04L47/6255 (US);
H04L47/6275 (US);
H04L49/3027 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/101 (US);
H04L45/40 (EP);
H04L49/25 (EP);
H04L49/351 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04L12/947, H04L12/931, H04L12/721 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETEILTES SPEICHERGITTER ZUR UMSCHALTUNG | [2021/01] | English: | SHARED MEMORY MESH FOR SWITCHING | [2021/01] | French: | MAILLE DE MÉMOIRE PARTAGÉE POUR COMMUTATION | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1142219 (POWER X LTD [GB]); | [XA]US2010049942 (KIM JOHN [US], et al) |