EP3758274 - COUNTERMEASURES AGAINST HARDWARE SIDE-CHANNEL ATTACKS ON CRYPTOGRAPHIC OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Santosh 7638 NE Prefontaine St Hillsboro, OR Oregon 97124 / US | 02 /
TOKUNAGA, Carlos 2111 NE 25th Ave M/S JF2-04 Hillsboro, OR Oregon 97124 / US | 03 /
VARNA, Avinash 400 N Coronado St, Apt 1056 Chandler, AZ Arizona 85224 / US | 04 /
DAS, Debayan 400 N River Road, Apt. 1736 West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | 05 /
FRIEL, Joseph 900 N Rural Rd., Apt 2024 Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20164851.6 | 23.03.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201916456308 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US201916456308 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758274 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758274 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, G06F21/72, G06F21/75 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/72 (EP,US);
H04L9/003 (EP,CN);
G06F21/123 (US);
G06F21/64 (US);
G06F21/755 (EP);
G06N3/08 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEGENMASSNAHMEN GEGEN HARDWARE-SEITENKANALATTACKEN AUF KRYPTOGRAPHISCHEN OPERATIONEN | [2021/01] | English: | COUNTERMEASURES AGAINST HARDWARE SIDE-CHANNEL ATTACKS ON CRYPTOGRAPHIC OPERATIONS | [2021/01] | French: | CONTREMESURES CONTRE LES ATTAQUES DE MATÉRIEL PAR CANAUX AUXILIAIRES SUR DES OPÉRATIONS CRYPTOGRAPHIQUES | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 29.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.07.2022 | AT | 27.07.2022 | CZ | 27.07.2022 | DK | 27.07.2022 | EE | 27.07.2022 | ES | 27.07.2022 | FI | 27.07.2022 | HR | 27.07.2022 | IT | 27.07.2022 | LT | 27.07.2022 | LV | 27.07.2022 | MC | 27.07.2022 | PL | 27.07.2022 | RO | 27.07.2022 | RS | 27.07.2022 | SE | 27.07.2022 | SI | 27.07.2022 | SK | 27.07.2022 | SM | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.10.2022 | GR | 28.10.2022 | IS | 27.11.2022 | PT | 28.11.2022 | IE | 23.03.2023 | LU | 23.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 27.07.2022 | |
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1107502 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] *; | [Y]WO2004025444 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 4-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 17 *; | [XY]WO2015094374 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1a,1b,2a,3,4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0035] - [0037] - [0042] - [0050] * [Y] 4-15; | [A]US2015268710 (BOSE PRADIP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] *; | [A]US9787171 (FORT JIMMY [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 11 * | by applicant | - "Algorithms for quantum computation: discrete logarithms and factoring", SHOR, P.W., Proceedings 35th Annual Symposium on Foundations of Computer Science, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press |