EP3721769 - DISPENSING DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A SHEET-LIKE FLAT PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hagleitner, Hans Georg Lindenallee 11 5700 Zell am See / AT | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2024/34] |
Former [2020/42] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 20164867.2 | 23.03.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | AT20190050315 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: AT 503152019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721769 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3721769 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/36 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A47K10/3606 (EP);
A47K10/3827 (AT);
A47K10/3637 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 24.03.2021 | Title | German: | AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINES BAHNFÖRMIGEN FLÄCHENPRODUKTES | [2020/42] | English: | DISPENSING DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A SHEET-LIKE FLAT PRODUCT | [2020/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT PLAT EN FORME DE BANDE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 24.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2058014 (BURGO SCOTT SPA); | [XI]EP1336368 (FORT JAMES CORP [US]); | [XI]CA2550357 (GLOBAL PLASTICS [CA]) | Examination | US2946587 | WO2009135240 | by applicant | WO2009135240 |