EP3705570 - USE OF MCOLN-1 MODULATORS TO REGULATE CELL MIGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Curie 26, rue d'Ulm 75248 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENNON-DUMENIL, Ana-Maria 82 rue Bobillot 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
VARGAS, Pablo 5 rue Poliveau 75005 Paris / FR | 03 /
BRETOU, Marine 145 rue d'Alesia 75014 Paris / FR | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20164904.3 | 10.02.2015 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | EP20140305172 | 10.02.2014 Original published format: EP 14305172 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705570 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0784, A61P31/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/04, A61P37/06, A61P43/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
C12N15/1138 (US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/57 (US);
C12N2310/14 (US);
C12N2500/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MCOLN-1-MODULATOREN ZUM REGELN DER ZELLMIGRATION | [2020/37] | English: | USE OF MCOLN-1 MODULATORS TO REGULATE CELL MIGRATION | [2020/37] | French: | UTILISATION DE MODULATEURS MCOLN-1 AFIN DE RÉGULER LA MIGRATION CELLULAIRE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15703778.9 / EP3105319 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9900137 (US HEALTH [US], et al); | [Y]WO9962537 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al); | [Y]US2003064363 (GOLDIN EHUD [US], et al); | by applicant | US4946778 | WO9808856 | WO9932619 | US2003064363 | WO2004007718 | US2004053876 | WO2004039941 | US2004102408 | WO2004076632 | WO2006029142 | WO2007041687 | WO2007140308 | WO2010149614 | WO2011072275 |