EP3690875 - TRAINING AND TESTING UTTERANCE-BASED FRAMEWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spotify AB Regeringsgatan 19 111 53 Stockholm / SE | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROMAND, Daniel c/o SPOTIFY AB Regeringsgatan 19 111 53 Stockholm / SE | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 5275 102 46 Stockholm / SE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 20165140.3 | 12.04.2018 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690875 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3690875 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/02, G10L15/06 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
G10L13/02 (EP,US);
G10L15/063 (EP,US);
G06F7/582 (US);
G10L15/07 (US);
G10L2015/0635 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRAINING UND PRÜFUNG VON ÄUSSERUNGSBASIERTEN RAHMEN | [2020/32] | English: | TRAINING AND TESTING UTTERANCE-BASED FRAMEWORKS | [2020/32] | French: | ENTRAINEMENT ET TEST D'UN SYSTEME COMPOSE DE PHRASES | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 04.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18167001.9 / EP3553773 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | Examination | US2016027430 | US2017270907 | US2017352353 | by applicant | US7096183 | US7567896 |