EP3714800 - METHOD OF FIXING SURGICAL INSTRUMENT TO ROBOT ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-0047 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGO, Kenji c/o Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-0047 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Kaoru c/o Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-0047 / JP | 03 /
USUKI, Yu c/o Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-0047 / JP | 04 /
BETSUGI, Shota c/o Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-0047 / JP | 05 /
NODA, Tomoaki c/o Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-0047 / JP | 06 /
TANAKA, Yoshiaki c/o Medicaroid Corporation 1-6-5, Minatojima Minami-machi Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-0047 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20165283.1 | 24.03.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | JP20190062803 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019062803 | JP20190187356 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019187356 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714800 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B34/30, A61B46/10 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/00 (EP);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/50 (US);
A61B2017/00199 (US);
A61B2017/00221 (US);
A61B2017/00398 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2017/00486 (US);
A61B2017/00973 (US);
A61B2034/2059 (US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61B2090/035 (EP);
A61B2090/066 (EP);
A61B2090/0805 (EP);
A61B34/37 (US);
A61B46/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTS AN EINEM ROBOTERARM | [2020/40] | English: | METHOD OF FIXING SURGICAL INSTRUMENT TO ROBOT ARM | [2020/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL SUR UN BRAS DE ROBOT | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/24] | 11.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006235436 (ANDERSON S C [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0096] , [0098] , [0099] , [0103] * [I] 2,3,10,11; | [XAI]EP1897511 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,8 * figure 14 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0064] , [0070] * [A] 12 [I] 2,3,10,11,14,15; | [XI]WO2011037394 (ETERNE INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9 * figures 1,3,5 * * paragraphs [0185] , [0186] , [0190] * [I] 2,3,10,11,14,15; | [XI]WO2015142958 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8 * figure 4 * * page 17, lines 9-14 * * page 20, lines 13-21 * * page 24, lines 10-15 * * page 25, lines 2-6 *[I] 2,3,10-12,14,15; | [XI]WO2018119136 (VERB SURGICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8,9,13 * paragraphs [0094] , [0097] , [0100] * [I] 2,3,10-12,14,15 | by applicant | JPS543864B |