EP3734563 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ROBUST MAN-DOWN ALARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Worthington, Stephen David 136 Everglade Circle SW Calgary, AB, T2Y 4N3 / CA | 02 /
Evans, Jerry Wayne HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Hogan, Patrick Gerard HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2021/10] |
Former [2020/49] | 01 /
Worthington, Stephen David Everglade Circle SW Calgary, AB, T2Y 4N3 / CA | ||
02 /
Evans, Jerry Wayne HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | |||
03 /
Hogan, Patrick Gerard HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | |||
Former [2020/45] | 01 /
Worthington, Stephen David HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
02 /
Evans, Jerry Wayne HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | |||
03 /
Hogan, Patrick Gerard HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/45] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20165730.1 | 20.01.2012 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | US201113015327 | 27.01.2011 Original published format: US201113015327 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734563 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3734563 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/04, G08B29/18, G08B21/12, G08B25/01, A61B5/00, A61B5/11 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G08B25/002 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (RU);
A61B5/1117 (EP);
G08B19/00 (RU);
G08B21/043 (EP,US);
G08B21/0446 (EP,RU,US);
G08B21/0492 (EP,US);
G08B21/12 (EP,RU,US);
G08B25/016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] |
Former [2020/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR STABILE TOTMANN-ALARME | [2020/45] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ROBUST MAN-DOWN ALARMS | [2020/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'AVERTISSEMENTS DE DÉTRESSE ROBUSTES | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12152018.3 / EP2482264 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | LU | 20.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
MC | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0007157 (SAFETY TECH IND LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 24, paragraphs 24-28 * [A] 7,13; | [A]US2004017300 (KOTZIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-7,12* paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0005] - [0006] - [0012] - [0026] - [0029] , [0031] , [0033] , [0035] , [0037] , [0041] , [0045] , [0048] - [0052] - [0056] , [0060]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2006282021 (DEVAUL RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0020] , [0060] , [0061] , [0067] , [0068] , [0071] , [0078] , [0086] , [0094] - [0099] - [0101] , [0113] , [0133] - [0143]; figures 1,2,3,5,8,10 * * paragraphs [0149] - [0150] - [0168] , [0171]; figures 11,15 *; | [IA]WO2007057692 (LUSORA LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,3-6 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 2, lines 1-4 * * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 12; figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 29 * * page 8, lines 1-31 * * page 10, lines 7-24 * [A] 7-15 |