EP3799332 - METHOD FOR MEASURING SENSING RANGE OF VEHICLE, APPARATUS AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Driving Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 105, 1st Floor, Building 1 No.10, Shangdishi Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gong, Guohao 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
Wang, Junping 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
Zhao, Tiankun 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
Gao, Dongchao 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 05 /
Wu, Zelin 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 06 /
Wang, Chengfa 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 07 /
Sun, Yongyi 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20165871.3 | 26.03.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | CN201910944409 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910944409 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799332 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799332 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/27, H04B17/29 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H04B17/27 (EP);
H04W4/022 (CN);
H04W4/023 (US);
G01S11/02 (US);
G08G1/0962 (US);
H04B17/29 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES ERFASSUNGSBEREICHS EINES FAHRZEUGS, VORRICHTUNG UND MEDIUM | [2021/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING SENSING RANGE OF VEHICLE, APPARATUS AND MEDIUM | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE PLAGE DE DÉTECTION D'UN VÉHICULE, APPAREIL ET SUPPORT | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22168251.1 / EP4047841 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2017299689 (VA VUTHA [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1A, 1B, 1C * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0115]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0138] * [A] 5,7,12,14 [I] 2-4,6,9-11,13; | [A]KR101915363B (HYUNDAI AUTOEVER CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0068] * |