EP3719778 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROBABILISTICALLY DETERMINING THE INTENDED FLIGHT ROUTE OF AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUAN, Yu HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Lu HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Nan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20166058.6 | 26.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | US201916373160 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US201916373160 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719778 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/04, G08G5/00 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
G08G5/045 (EP);
G08G5/003 (CN);
G08G5/0078 (EP,US);
G08G5/0008 (EP,CN,US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,CN);
G08G5/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROBABILISTISCHEN BESTIMMUNG DER BEABSICHTIGTEN FLUGROUTE EINES FLUGZEUGS | [2020/41] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROBABILISTICALLY DETERMINING THE INTENDED FLIGHT ROUTE OF AN AIRCRAFT | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTERMINATION PROBABILISTE D'ITINÉRAIRE DE VOL PRÉVU D'UN AÉRONEF | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 26.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3324386 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,15 * claims 1-15 * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0027] * [I] 3,5-9,12-14; | [A]EP2858061 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP2784764 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-14 * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * |