EP3715887 - INSPECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sintokogio, Ltd. 28-12 Meieki 3-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4506424 / JP | [2024/28] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Sintokogio, Ltd. 28-12, Meleki 3-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6424 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUNODA, Ryoichi Oharu-cho, Ama-gun Aichi 4901144 / JP | 02 /
HAMADA, Takayuki Oharu-cho, Ama-gun Aichi 4901144 / JP | [2024/28] |
Former [2020/40] | 01 /
TSUNODA, Ryoichi c/o SINTOKOGIO, LTD. Oharu-Jigyosho, 71-2, Aza-Tukeda, Oaza-Nishijo Ama-gun Oharu-cho, Aichi 4901144 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMADA, Takayuki c/o SINTOKOGIO, LTD. Oharu-Jigyosho, 71-2, Aza-Tukeda, Oaza-Nishijo Ama-gun Oharu-cho, Aichi 4901144 / JP | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 20166371.3 | 27.03.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | JP20190068625 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019068625 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715887 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3715887 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, H05K13/04 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G01R31/2886 (EP);
G01R31/2867 (EP,KR);
G01R31/2601 (CN);
G01R1/0408 (CN);
G01R31/2808 (EP);
G01R31/2865 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | INSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/40] | English: | INSPECTING DEVICE | [2020/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 30.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61293749 (NIKKEN KOSAKUSHO KK); | [A]EP0821549 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [I]US5894217 (IGARASHI NORIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0933985 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]EP1032251 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]EP1154680 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]US2001047586 (KAWAI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008102592 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP5160819B | Examination | JPH09257873 | by applicant | JPS5839021 | JPH0423446 | JP2016206150 |