EP3701950 - METHOD OF TREATMENT AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A DUAL PL3K DELTA-GAMMA KINASE INHIBITOR AND A CORTICOSTEROID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhizen Pharmaceuticals S.A. Fritz Courvoisier 40 2300 La Chaux de Fonds / CH | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumar Venkata Satya Vakkalanka, Swaroop Fritz Courvoisier 40 2300 La Chaux de Fonds / CH | 02 /
Viswanadha, Srikant c/o Incozen Therapeutics Pvt. Ltd. 450-Alexandria Knowledge Park, Shameerpet 500078 Hyderabad / IN | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 20166664.1 | 03.09.2015 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | IN2014CHE4287 | 03.09.2014 Original published format: IN 4287CH2014 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701950 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K31/56, A61K31/573, A61K45/06, A61P37/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,AU,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,AU,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,AU,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,AU,EA,IL);
A61P11/02 (EP,IL);
A61P11/06 (EP,AU,EA,IL);
A61P11/16 (EP,IL);
A61P13/10 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P15/02 (EP,IL);
A61P17/00 (EP,IL);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL);
A61P17/04 (EP,IL);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL);
A61P17/10 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P19/04 (EP,IL);
A61P19/10 (EP,IL);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL);
A61P21/04 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P27/14 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P37/00 (EP,EA,IL);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,AU,IL);
A61P37/08 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P5/14 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP,US);
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (US,AU,EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,AU,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DUAL-PL3K-DELTA-GAMMA-KINASE-INHIBITOR UND EINEM KORTIKOSTEROID | [2020/36] | English: | METHOD OF TREATMENT AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A DUAL PL3K DELTA-GAMMA KINASE INHIBITOR AND A CORTICOSTEROID | [2020/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT ET COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DOUBLE DE LA KINASE PL3K DELTA-GAMMA ET UN CORTICOSTÉROÏDE | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 21.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15774713.0 / EP3188759 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012151525 (RHIZEN PHARMACEUTICALS SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * table 1; compounds 6,6a,6b * * paragraphs [0089] , [0093] , [0182] , [0185] , [0226] , [0562] * * table 2 * * page 217, lines 1-6,24,31,34 *; | [X]WO2014072937 (RHIZEN PHARMACEUTICALS SA [CH]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0033] , [0036] , [0075] , [0090] ** compound Compound A1 * | by applicant | GB1578446 | WO2006005611 | WO2009088986 | WO2009088990 | WO2010002804 | WO2011008302 | WO2011029547 | WO2012097000 | WO2012123482 | - HIRSCH et al., Pharmacol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 118, pages 192 - 205 | - MARONE et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20080000), vol. 1784, pages 159 - 185 | - ROMMEL et al., Nat. Rev. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 7, pages 191 - 201 | - RUCKLE et al., Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20060000), vol. 5, pages 903 - 918 | - KONRAD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20080000), vol. 283, pages 33296 - 33303 | - LAFFARGUE et al., Immunity, (20020000), vol. 16, pages 441 - 451 | - ALI et al., J. Immunol., (20080000), vol. 180, pages 2538 - 2544 | - JOU et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (20020000), vol. 22, pages 8580 - 8591 | - CLAYTON et al., J. Exp. Med., (20020000), vol. 196, pages 753 - 763 | - THOMPSON et al., Chemistry & Biology, (20100000), vol. 17, pages 101 - 102 | - PIXU LIU, Nature Reviews Drug Discovery, (20090000), vol. 8, pages 627 - 644 | - NATHAN T., Mol Cancer Ther., (20090100), vol. 8, no. 1 | - ROMINA MARONE et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20080000), vol. 1784, pages 159 - 185 | - M.J. GREEN et al., J. Med. Chem., (19820000), vol. 25, pages 1492 - 1495 | US20100938609 | WO2012US36594 |