EP3699189 - HIGH AFFINITY PD-1 AGENTS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RING, Aaron Michael 504 Chapel Street 2nd Floor New Haven, CT 06511 / US | 02 /
KRUSE, Andrew 869 W. Roxbury Pkwy Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 03 /
MANGLIK, Aashish 945 Crane Street Apt. A Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
WEISSMAN, Irving L 747 Santa Ynez Street Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 05 /
MAUTE, Roy Louis 75 Sheridan Street 202 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 06 /
McCRACKEN, Melissa N 910 Rich Avenue, Apt. 7 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 07 /
GORDON, Sydney 63 Abrams Court 316 Stanford, CA 94305 / US | [2021/21] |
Former [2020/35] | 01 /
RING, Aaron Michael 504 Chapel Street 2nd Floor New Haven, CT 06511 / US | ||
02 /
KRUSE, Andrew 840 Chimalus Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
03 /
MANGLIK, Aashish 945 Crane Street Apt. A Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
WEISSMAN, Irving L 747 Santa Ynez Street Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
05 /
MAUTE, Roy Louis 75 Sheridan Street 202 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
06 /
McCRACKEN, Melissa N 910 Rich Avenue, Apt. 7 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
07 /
GORDON, Sydney 63 Abrams Court 316 Stanford, CA 94305 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20166891.0 | 07.08.2015 | [2020/35] | Priority number, date | US201462035316P | 08.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462035316 P | US201562150789P | 21.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562150789 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699189 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K14/47, A61K51/08, A61K38/00, A61P35/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (EP,US);
A61K38/1761 (US);
A61K38/177 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K48/00 (US);
A61K51/08 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (US);
A61K51/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (US);
C07K14/70532 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HOCHAFFINE PD-1-WIRKSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2020/35] | English: | HIGH AFFINITY PD-1 AGENTS AND METHODS OF USE | [2020/35] | French: | AGENTS PD-1 À HAUTE AFFINITÉ ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 24.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15829652.5 / EP3177640 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011159023 (LANGERMANN SOLOMON [US]); | by applicant | WO9303769 | WO9309239 | WO9319191 | WO9412649 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9511984 | WO0118048 | US7169874 |