EP3718712 - VARIABLE ADAPTATION GRIPPING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEC S.r.l. Località Lagarine 4 38050 Scurelle (TN) / IT | For all designated states Gilli, Walter Via Giuseppe Giusti, 7 38041 Albiano (Trento) / IT | For all designated states Pisetta, Remo Via Trento 6 38041 Albiano (Trento) / IT | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLI, Walter Via Giuseppe Giusti 7 38041 Albiano TN / IT | 02 /
PISETTA, Remo Via Trento 6 38041 Albiano TN / IT | 03 /
BALDESSARI, Claudio Via Principale n. 83/2 38050 Novaledo TN / IT | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Manfrin, Marta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Stradone San Fermo 21 sc. B 37121 Verona (VR) / IT | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 20167020.5 | 31.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | IT20190005096 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: IT201900005096 | [2020/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718712 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3718712 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/00, B25J11/00, B25J15/02 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
B25J15/0028 (EP);
B25J11/0055 (EP);
B25J15/0033 (EP);
B25J15/009 (EP);
B25J15/0253 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GREIFSYSTEM MIT VARIABLER ANPASSUNG | [2020/41] | English: | VARIABLE ADAPTATION GRIPPING SYSTEM | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉHENSION À ADAPTATION VARIABLE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 31.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57201194 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS59201778 (SANRITSU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * * abstract *; | [A]JPH06190764 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 ** abstract *; | [A]JPH1080890 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15 * figures 2, 3, 5-7 * * abstract *; | [A]JP2002321184 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0016] * |