EP3722201 - VESSEL PROPULSION SYSTEM AND VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Shizuoka-ken Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKASHITA, Yohei Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Makoto Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
SAKASHITA, Yohei c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
ITO, Makoto c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 20167082.5 | 31.03.2020 | [2020/42] | Priority number, date | JP20190070880 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019070880 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722201 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3722201 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/21, B63H25/02, B63H25/42 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
B63H21/21 (EP);
B63H25/42 (EP,US);
B63H25/02 (EP);
B63H5/08 (US);
B63H5/125 (US);
B63H2020/003 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIFFSANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND SCHIFF | [2020/42] | English: | VESSEL PROPULSION SYSTEM AND VESSEL | [2020/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION DE RÉCIPIENT ET RÉCIPIENT | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 31.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1364870 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0099] , [ 100] * * figure - *[I] 12; | [XI]US2008254689 (KAJI HIROTAKA [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0069] - [0071] * * figure - * [I] 12; | [XI]EP3000718 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 12 * [I] 7 | by applicant | JP5481059B |