EP3718646 - PLATE PRODUCTION SYSTEM WITH VIBRATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SR-Schindler Maschinen - Anlagetechnik GmbH Hofer Strasse 24 93057 Regensburg Bayern / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stöcker, Robert Falkensteinstrasse 6 93197 Zeitlarn / DE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 20 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Firmungstraße 4-6 56068 Koblenz / DE | Application number, filing date | 20167207.8 | 31.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | DE201910108840 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019108840 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718646 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3718646 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/00, B28B5/08, B28B1/087, B06B1/16 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B06B1/166 (EP);
B28B1/087 (EP);
B28B5/08 (EP);
B28B7/0097 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | B06B1/16, B28B1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PLATTENPRODUKTIONSANLAGE MIT RÜTTELEINRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | PLATE PRODUCTION SYSTEM WITH VIBRATING DEVICE | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUES POURVU DE DISPOSITIF DE SECOUAGE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 19.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE19735268 (KARL REKERS MASCHINEN UND STAH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1,5,6; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3,5,6 [I] 7; | [XYI]DE69531685T (COBBER ENGINEERING S R L [IT]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1,2,4,5,7,8 * [Y] 2,3,5,6 [I] 4,7; | [A]DE102007012593 (SR SCHINDLER STEINBEARBEITUNGS [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * | Examination | DE10249551 | - Anlagenbau Maschinen-U, "REKERS REKERS", (20160314), URL: https://www.rekers.de/wp-content/uploads/Imagebroschuere_DEU-ENG.pdf, (20221017), XP055972044 |