EP3890095 - BATTERY SYSTEM WITH LIGHT-BASED COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20 Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofer, Maximilian Siebenbrunn 26 8230 Hartberg / AT | 02 /
Klobasa, Roland Schippingerstrasse 46 8051 Graz / AT | 03 /
Kraberger, Gernot Kastellfeldgasse 7 8010 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | 01 /
Hofer, Maximilian Siebenbrunn 26 8230 Hartberg / AT | ||
02 /
Klobasa, Roland Schippingerstrasse 46 8051 Graz / AT | |||
03 /
Gernot, Kraberger Kastellfeldgasse 7 8010 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 20167241.7 | 31.03.2020 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890095 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, G08C23/04, H04B10/11, // H01M2/10, H01M2/34 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,KR);
G01R31/396 (KR);
H01M10/4207 (KR);
H01M10/482 (KR);
H01M50/204 (KR);
H01M50/258 (KR);
H01M50/572 (EP,KR);
H04B10/114 (EP,KR);
H01M2010/4271 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIESYSTEM MIT LICHTBASIERTER KOMMUNIKATION | [2021/40] | English: | BATTERY SYSTEM WITH LIGHT-BASED COMMUNICATION | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE AYANT UNE COMMUNICATION BASÉE SUR LA LUMIÈRE | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 19.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6094031 (SHIMANE IWAO [JP], et al); | [A]US2018109328 (EBERHARD MARTIN [US], et al); | [XI]DE102017204138 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]US2019229376 (PETRAKIVSKYI OLEG [UA], et al) |