EP3698904 - MACHINE TOOL AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | For all designated states Citizen Machinery Co., Ltd. 4107-6 Oaza-Miyota Miyotamachi Kitasaku-gun Nagano 389-0206 / JP | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sannomiya, Kazuhiko c/o Citizen Machinery Co., Ltd. 4107-6 Oaza-Miyota Miyotamachi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0206 / JP | 02 /
Nakaya, Takaichi c/o Citizen Machinery Co., Ltd. 4107-6 Oaza-Miyota Miyotamachi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0206 / JP | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20167352.2 | 06.10.2015 | [2020/35] | Priority number, date | JP20140207105 | 08.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014207105 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698904 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23B1/00, B23G1/04, B23B25/02, // B23B5/46 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
B23B25/02 (EP,US);
B23G1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B23G3/00 (US);
B23Q15/12 (EP,KR,US);
G05B19/186 (US);
G05B19/4093 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2260/0625 (EP,US);
B23G2240/08 (KR);
G05B2219/36198 (US);
G05B2219/37435 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/05] |
Former [2020/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINE UND STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2020/35] | English: | MACHINE TOOL AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MACHINE TOOL | [2020/35] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MACHINE-OUTIL | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/05] | 30.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15848714.0 / EP3205430 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3174404 (FINDLEY HOWARD J [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 7, line 13 - line 36; figure - * * column 7, line 16 - line 36; figure 11 * * column 7, line 68 - column 8, line 11; figure 11 * * the whole document *; | [A]GB991336 (FISCHER AG GEORG) [A] 1-5* figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]US4640156 (NAKAGAWA TAKEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5076744 (KITAGAWA KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008232916 (SCHIEMANN HARRY [CH]) [X] 1-5 * figure - * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [A]JP2012045693 (MOMOSE SEISAKUSHO KK, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2001150201 |