EP3888900 - MANUFACTURING OF A FLEXIBLE PACKAGING WEB WITH PREPARED ACCESS OPENINGS COVERED BY RESEALABLE ADHESIVE LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCL Label AG Weststrasse 12 5426 Lengnau / CH | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAUSER, Reto CCL Label AG Weststraße 12 5426 LENGNAU / CH | 02 /
RUTZINGER, Elke CCL Label AG Weststraße 12 5426 LENGNAU / CH | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 20168042.8 | 03.04.2020 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888900 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B31B70/81, B31B70/92, B65D75/58, B31B70/85, B31B70/94, B31D1/00, B31D1/02, B65H18/00 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B31B70/8122 (EP);
B31B70/813 (EP);
B31B70/85 (EP);
B31B70/942 (EP);
B31D1/0043 (EP);
B65D75/5838 (EP);
B65D75/5894 (EP);
B65D85/10568 (EP);
B65H18/28 (EP);
B65H23/1955 (EP);
B65H2301/331 (EP);
B65H2301/443243 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER FLEXIBLEN VERPACKUNGSBAHN MIT VORBEREITETEN, DURCH WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE KLEBEETIKETTEN ABGEDECKTEN ZUGANGSÖFFNUNGEN | [2021/40] | English: | MANUFACTURING OF A FLEXIBLE PACKAGING WEB WITH PREPARED ACCESS OPENINGS COVERED BY RESEALABLE ADHESIVE LABELS | [2021/40] | French: | FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE D'EMBALLAGE SOUPLE AVEC DES OUVERTURES D'ACCÈS PRÉPARÉES PAR DES ÉTIQUETTES ADHÉSIVES REFERMABLES | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 29.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9219522 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 15 * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 18; figure 2 * [A] 1-14; | [XA]EP0855354 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 15 * column 3, line 5 - line 26; figures 1, 2 * [A] 1-14; | [XA]CN208471143U (DONGGUAN BOSHENG MAT CO LTD) [X] 15 * paragraph [0044]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-14; | [A]US2013320019 (TINOCO JUAN CARLOS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2008060751 (ARRINDELL EVAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 48]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP3299314 | WO2014179457 |