EP3725422 - DEVICE FOR LACQUER TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Airbus (S.A.S.) 2, Rond Point Emile Dewoitine 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahlen, Pierre c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Kümmel, Waldemar Kirchbergstraße 14 82216 Maisach / DE | 03 /
Kress, Daniel Blücherstraße 33 86165 Augsburg / DE | 04 /
Schepp, Christian c/o KUKA Schweissanlagen GmbH Blücherstraße 144 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP - Hamburg Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | Bird & Bird LLP Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20168066.7 | 03.04.2020 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | DE201910109790 | 12.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019109790 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725422 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/02, B05C1/08, B05C9/12 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B05C1/0808 (EP,US);
B05C1/027 (EP,US);
B05C1/0813 (EP,US);
B05C9/12 (EP,US);
B05D1/28 (EP);
B05D3/067 (EP,US);
B29C35/0888 (EP);
B29C35/10 (EP);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C59/046 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LACKÜBERTRAGUNG | [2020/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR LACQUER TRANSFER | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE VERNIS | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5425848 (HAISMA JAN [NL], et al); | [Y]US2006066703 (KADOMATSU TETSUZO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2015273762 (OKAMOTO EIJI [JP]); | [YA]WO2015155128 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) |