EP3892982 - CARTRIDGE FOR SPECTROSCOPIC DEVICE FOR QUANTIFICATION IN BIOLOGICAL FLUIDS, RESPECTIVE KIT AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gazellepodium - Lda Praca Navegador Vianese João Álvares Fagundes n.º 284 r/c Esq.º Viana do Castelo Concelho 4935 - 054 Darque / PT | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARVALHO DE SOUSA, Nuno Jorge Rua do Bolama 241 RC 4200-139 Porto / PT | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 20168719.1 | 08.04.2020 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892982 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, B01L3/00, G01N21/359, G01N33/49 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
G01N21/359 (EP);
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
A61B5/0075 (US);
B01L3/50 (US);
G01N21/03 (EP);
G01N2021/0385 (EP,US);
G01N33/487 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASSETTE FÜR SPEKTROSKOPISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG IN BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN, ENTSPRECHENDES KIT UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/41] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR SPECTROSCOPIC DEVICE FOR QUANTIFICATION IN BIOLOGICAL FLUIDS, RESPECTIVE KIT AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2021/41] | French: | CARTOUCHE POUR DISPOSITIF SPECTROSCOPIQUE DE QUANTIFICATION DANS DES FLUIDES BIOLOGIQUES, KIT CORRESPONDANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTLISATION | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 13.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5523054 (SWITALSKI STEVEN C [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 4, line 6 - line 61 * * column 2, line 2 - line 34 * * figure 2 *; | [XY]WO9725608 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10,13,14 * page 3, line 2 - line 13 * * page 4, line 10 - line 11 * * page 6, line 9 - line 22 * * page 7, line 11 - line 15 * * page 8, line 26 - line 30 * * page 9, line 21 - line 22 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 1,2 * * page 13, line 30 - line 31 * [Y] 3,4,15; | [XY]US2012257188 (YAN JASPER S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0 32] , [0043] , [0049] * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]WO2016065115 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0050] , [0052] , [0072] , [0090] * * figure 2A * [Y] 3,4; | [Y] - CUI CAI-JING ET AL, "Near-infrared diffuse reflectance spectroscopy with sample spots and chemometrics for fast determination of bovine serum albumin in micro-volume samples", CHINESE CHEMICAL LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130117), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CCLET.2012.12.012, ISSN 1001-8417, pages 67 - 69, XP028970974 [Y] 15 * abstract * * page 68, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cclet.2012.12.012 |