EP3750918 - TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR (TNF) SUPERFAMILY RECEPTOR BINDING MOLECULES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGM Biosciences, Inc. 325 E. Middlefield Rd. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Beatrice Tien-Yi 860 Williams Way 4 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
Schwarzer, Max Allen 553 Mimosa Court Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
Keyt, Bruce Alan 1180 Lakeview Drive Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 04 /
Baliga, Ramesh 2237 Hopkins Avenue Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 20168740.7 | 20.01.2016 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | US201562105323P | 20.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562105323 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750918 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K14/705, C07K16/30, A61P35/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/28 (IL);
C07K16/2875 (IL,KR);
C07K16/2866 (IL,US);
C07K14/70575 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/30 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/56 (IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TUMORNEKROSEFAKTOR-SUPERFAMILIENREZEPTORBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/51] | English: | TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR (TNF) SUPERFAMILY RECEPTOR BINDING MOLECULES AND USES THEREOF | [2020/51] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON DU RÉCEPTEUR DE LA SUPERFAMILLE DU FACTEUR DE NÉCROSE TUMORALE (TNF) ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16740686.7 / EP3247728 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1396500 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]); | [A]US2005214210 (SALCEDO THEODORA W [US], et al); | [A]WO2013049254 (JN BIOSCIENCES LLC [US]); | [X]US2014294825 (TSO J YUN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4683195 | US5585089 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5892019 | US5939598 | US6180370 | US2006269555 | US7244429 | US7521048 | US8029783 |