EP3696813 - AUDIO ENCODER FOR ENCODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL, METHOD FOR ENCODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL AND COMPUTER PROGRAM UNDER CONSIDERATION OF A DETECTED PEAK SPECTRAL REGION IN AN UPPER FREQUENCY BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/34] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Multrus, Markus c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Neukam, Christian c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Schnell, Markus c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Schubert, Benjamin c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20168799.3 | 06.04.2017 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | EP20160164951 | 12.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16164951 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696813 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3696813 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/26, // G10L19/02, G10L19/04, G10L19/028, G10L19/038 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
G10L19/265 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G10L19/02 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G10L19/0204 (CN,US);
G10L19/028 (EP,CN,US);
G10L19/03 (CN,RU,US);
G10L19/032 (CN,RU,US);
G10L19/04 (EP,CN,US);
G10L19/06 (CN,KR);
G10L19/12 (CN,US);
G10L19/16 (CN,US);
G10L19/26 (CN,RU,US);
G10L21/007 (CN,US);
G10L21/02 (CN,US);
G10L21/0208 (CN,US);
G10L21/0324 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUDIOCODIERER ZUM CODIEREN EINES AUDIOSIGNALS, VERFAHREN ZUM CODIEREN EINES AUDIOSIGNALS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG EINES DETEKTIERTEN SPITZENSPEKTRALBEREICHS IN EINEM OBEREN FREQUENZBAND | [2022/18] | English: | AUDIO ENCODER FOR ENCODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL, METHOD FOR ENCODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL AND COMPUTER PROGRAM UNDER CONSIDERATION OF A DETECTED PEAK SPECTRAL REGION IN AN UPPER FREQUENCY BAND | [2020/34] | French: | CODEUR AUDIO POUR LE CODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE PRENANT EN CONSIDÉRATION UNE RÉGION SPECTRALE DE CRÊTE DÉTECTÉE DANS UNE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCES SUPÉRIEURE | [2022/18] |
Former [2020/34] | AUDIOCODIERER ZUR CODIERUNG EINES AUDIOSIGNALS, VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG EINES AUDIOSIGNALS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG EINES ERKANNTEN SPITZENSPEKTRALBEREICHS IN EINEM OBEREN FREQUENZBAND | ||
Former [2020/34] | CODEUR AUDIO POUR CODER UN SIGNAL AUDIO, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE TENANT COMPTE D'UNE RÉGION SPECTRALE MAXIMALE DÉTECTÉE DANS UNE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCE SUPÉRIEURE | Examination procedure | 03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 03.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17715745.0 / EP3443557 | Divisional application(s) | EP22196902.5 / EP4134953 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | IE | 06.04.2023 | LU | 06.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NO | 26.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012017621 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013147668 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]EP2980794 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |