EP3745133 - METHODS OF PRODUCING OMEGA-HYDROXYLATED FATTY ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIRMER, Andreas, W. c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
WANG, Haibo c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
DEL CARDAYRE, Stephen, B. c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
HU, Zhihao c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
HOM, Louis, G. c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 06 /
ZHU, Baolong c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 07 /
CHANG, Cindy c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 08 /
POPOVA, Emanuela, E. c/o Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20168885.0 | 16.06.2014 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | US201361835464P | 14.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361835464 P | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745133 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/92, C12N9/02, C12P7/42, C12P7/64 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
C12P7/6409 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/0008 (EP,US);
C12N9/0071 (EP,US);
C12N9/0077 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/1029 (KR);
C12N9/16 (KR);
C12P7/18 (EP,US);
C12P7/42 (EP,US);
C12P7/6436 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y114/14001 (EP,US);
C12Y114/15003 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (US);
C12Y101/00 (EP,US);
C12Y102/01042 (EP,US);
C12Y203/0102 (KR);
C12Y203/01075 (KR);
C12Y301/01005 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OMEGA-HYDROXYLIERTEN FETTSÄUREDERIVATEN | [2020/49] | English: | METHODS OF PRODUCING OMEGA-HYDROXYLATED FATTY ACID DERIVATIVES | [2020/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDES GRAS OMÉGA-HYDROXYLÉS | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 12.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14738962.1 / EP2984490 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012071439 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [A]US8283143 (HU ZHIHAO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013024114 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al); | by applicant | US5000000 | US5028539 | WO9116427 | US5424202 | US5482846 | US5602030 | US5939250 | US5965408 | US7169588 | WO2010127318 | US8097439 | US8110093 | US8110670 | US2012070868 | US8183028 | WO2012071439 | US8232924 | US8268599 | US8283143 | US8313934 | US8323924 | US8372610 | WO2013024114 | US8530221 |