EP3892473 - DATA CARRIER WITH PROTECTION AGAINST SUBSEQUENT LASER MARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES DIS FRANCE SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/06] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states Gemalto AG Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12 5000 Aarau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAILER, Christian C/O THALES DIS FRANCE SA, Intellectual Property Department 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 MEUDON / FR | 02 /
EGLI, Stefan C/O THALES DIS FRANCE SA, Intellectual Property Department 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 MEUDON / FR | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Lotaut, Yacine Diaw Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Lotaut, Yacine Diaw Thales Dis France SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Application number, filing date | 20169033.6 | 09.04.2020 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892473 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/41 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B42D25/41 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (US);
B42D25/328 (US);
B42D25/23 (US);
B42D25/24 (US);
B42D25/29 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGER MIT SCHUTZ VOR NACHFOLGENDER LASERMARKIERUNG | [2021/41] | English: | DATA CARRIER WITH PROTECTION AGAINST SUBSEQUENT LASER MARKING | [2021/41] | French: | SUPPORT DE DONNÉES DOTÉ D'UNE PROTECTION CONTRE LE MARQUAGE AU LASER ULTÉRIEUR | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011204617 (SUGDEN MATTHEW CHARLES [GB], et al); | [X]EP3321095 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) |