EP3896110 - COMPOSITE ARTICLE COMPRISING A TEXTILE LAYER AND A FOAM LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOEHNKE, Lutz Obstgarten 8 51491 Overath / DE | 02 /
KUSAN-BINDELS, Jacqueline Dünenweg 41 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
STERN, Frank-Stefan In der Auen 65 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
BITTNER, Natalie Kleiberweg 4 50226 Frechen / DE | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Davepon, Björn Patentanwaltskanzlei Davepon Schloss Dyck 41363 Jüchen / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 20169347.0 | 14.04.2020 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896110 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/75, C08G18/78, A62B17/00, C08G18/72 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
C08G18/791 (EP);
C08G18/32 (EP);
C08G18/4833 (EP);
C08G18/667 (EP);
C08G18/725 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/758 (EP);
C08G18/798 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP);
C08G2340/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDARTIKEL MIT EINER TEXTILSCHICHT UND EINER SCHAUMSCHICHT | [2021/42] | English: | COMPOSITE ARTICLE COMPRISING A TEXTILE LAYER AND A FOAM LAYER | [2021/42] | French: | ARTICLE COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE TEXTILE ET UNE COUCHE DE MOUSSE | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019352445 (ZHAO DONG BO [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * example 3; table 2 * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0151]; claim 29 ** paragraph [0122] * | by applicant | EP1721720 | JP2018016904 | EP3611203 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 82919-37-7 |