EP3744326 - DOSING REGIMEN FOR MISSED DOSES FOR LONG-ACTING INJECTABLE PALIPERIDONE ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville, NJ 08560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOPAL, Srihari 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville, NJ New Jersey 08560 / US | 02 /
RAVENSTIJN, Paulien Gerarda Maria Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
RUSSU, Alberto Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
SAMTANI, Mahesh Narain 920 Route 202 Raritan Raritan, NJ New Jersey 08869 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/49] | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20169861.0 | 30.03.2016 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | US201562144054P | 07.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144054 P | US201562162596P | 15.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562162596 P | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744326 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744326 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K9/10, A61P25/18, A61P25/24, A61K9/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (KR);
A61K47/12 (KR);
A61K47/26 (KR);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61K9/0024 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/24 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 02.06.2021 | ME | 02.06.2021 | Validation states | MA | 02.06.2021 | MD | 02.06.2021 | Title | German: | DOSIERSCHEMA FÜR VERPASSTE DOSEN FÜR LANGWIRKENDE INJIZIERBARE PALIPERIDONESTER | [2020/49] | English: | DOSING REGIMEN FOR MISSED DOSES FOR LONG-ACTING INJECTABLE PALIPERIDONE ESTERS | [2020/49] | French: | SCHÉMA DE TRAITEMENT EN CAS DE DOSES OUBLIÉES POUR DES ESTERS DE PALIPÉRIDONE INJECTABLES À ACTION PROLONGÉE | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 02.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.11.2023 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16777058.5 / EP3280416 | Divisional application(s) | EP23214037.6 / EP4349323 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2024
30.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE Accord Healthcare Ltd Sage House 319 Pinner Road North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB Opponent's representative Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | 02
28.08.2024
30.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | 03
04.09.2024
05.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | 04
04.09.2024
05.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN 13 1XR / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 05
04.09.2024
06.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Sandoz AG Centralbahnstrasse 4 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 06
05.09.2024
06.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 07
05.09.2024
06.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 08
05.09.2024
06.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road HX1 2HY West Yorkshire, Halifax / GB Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | 09
06.09.2024
09.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Advanz Pharma Services (UK) Ltd. Capital House, 1st Floor 85 King William Street London EC4N 7BL / GB Opponent's representative Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2024
30.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE Accord Healthcare Ltd Sage House 319 Pinner Road North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB Opponent's representative Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | ||
02
28.08.2024
30.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | |||
03
04.09.2024
05.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | |||
04
04.09.2024
05.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN 13 1XR / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
05
04.09.2024
Sandoz AG Centralbahnstrasse 4 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
06
05.09.2024
STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
07
05.09.2024
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2024/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2024
Accord Healthcare Ltd Sage House 319 Pinner Road North Harrow Middlesex HA1 4HF / GB Opponent's representative Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | ||
02
28.08.2024
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | 18.09.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009163519 (VERMEULEN AN [BE], et al); | [Y]US2011105536 (LEWYN-BRISCOE PETER H [US], et al); | by applicant | US5254556 | US6077843 | US6555544 | WO2006114384 | US2009163519 | other | WO2016164218 | Opposition | US2011105536 | US2009163519 | WO2011053829 | WO2016164218 |