EP3730825 - BRACKET FOR A NAIL GUN AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/44] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR A BRACKET FOR A NAIL GUN | ||
[2022/33] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 34600 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE ROUX, Adrien 14 Rue Georges Teissier Saint Etienne / FR | 02 /
WILSON, Eric J. 33250 Arthur Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20170557.1 | 21.04.2020 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201962837596P | 23.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962837596 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730825 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/123, H02G3/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
F16L3/1233 (EP);
B25C7/00 (US);
H02G3/263 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | F16L3/123, H02G3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTERUNG FÜR EINE NAGELPISTOLE UND VERFAHREN | [2022/33] | English: | BRACKET FOR A NAIL GUN AND METHOD | [2022/33] | French: | SUPPORT POUR UN PISTOLET CLOUEUR ET PROCÉDÉ | [2022/33] |
Former [2020/44] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE HALTERUNG FÜR EINE NAGELPISTOLE | ||
Former [2020/44] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR A BRACKET FOR A NAIL GUN | ||
Former [2020/44] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SUPPORT POUR UN PISTOLET CLOUEUR | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 28.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2013166 (GUNNEBO BRUKS AB) [X] 1,2,11-14 * pages 1, 2 * * figure - * [Y] 3-7 [I] 8-10,15; | [XY]WO2005015703 (PIRELLI GENERAL PLC [GB], et al) [X] 14,15 * page 7, line 17 - page 19, line l * * figure - * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]WO2014135912 (LUDWIG & MATTHIAS FEIL GBR [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * page 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2553491 (CIP FASTENING SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1* the whole document * |