EP3771324 - LOADING AND/OR SCHREDDING CARRIAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [2021/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POINTNER, Walter Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 02 /
REININGER, Markus Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 03 /
PFEIFFER, Stefan Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 04 /
HOFINGER, Markus Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 05 /
WEIßENBÖCK, Thomas Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/13] | 01 /
POINTNER, Walter Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / DE | ||
02 /
REININGER, Markus Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / DE | |||
03 /
PFEIFFER, Stefan Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / DE | |||
04 /
HOFINGER, Markus Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / DE | |||
05 /
WEIßENBÖCK, Thomas Industriezeile 1 4710 Grieskirchen / DE | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/05] | Application number, filing date | 20170593.6 | 21.04.2020 | [2021/05] | Priority number, date | DE201920104154U | 29.07.2019 Original published format: DE 202019104154 U | [2021/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771324 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3771324 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3771324 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D90/00 | [2021/05] | CPC: |
A01D90/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2021/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LADE- UND/ODER HÄCKSELWAGEN | [2021/05] | English: | LOADING AND/OR SCHREDDING CARRIAGE | [2021/05] | French: | REMORQUE POUR CHARGEMENT DE FOURRAGE ET/OU DE HACHAGE | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 17.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.11.2023 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0477716 (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [X] 4 * column 8, lines 6-10; figures 1,3 *; | [AD]DE102006039672 (ALOIS POETTINGER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0035]; figures 2-4 *; | [AD]AT13920U (FORAGE INNOVATIONS BV [NL]) [AD] 1-3,5-15* paragraphs [0017] - [0020]; figures 1-2 *; | [AD]EP2545763 (FORAGE INNOVATIONS BV [NL]) [AD] 1-3,5-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102015103688 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0035]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102015104390 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0035]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP3320767 (BEHEERMAATSCHAPPIJ SCHUITEMAKER B V [NL]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * | Examination | DE20014129U | DE102006039672 | DE102007062025 | EP3590324 | by applicant | DE102006039672 | AT13920U | EP2545763 |