EP3730783 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A GEARBOX OF A WIND TURBINE UPTOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España, S.L. Calle Roc Boronat 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2023/50] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANIKAS, Brian William 2690 Balltown Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
DAVIDSON, Paul Howard 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
SANDER, Michael Frederick 2690 Balltown Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 04 /
HOYT, Jacob Thomas 3348 Wyss Road Cazenovia, NY 13035 / US | 05 /
WELSH, Jason James 309 N. Owen Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | 06 /
HOLMES, Kevin L. 5554 Babbit Road Portageville, NY 14536 / US | [2023/22] |
Former [2020/44] | 01 /
Manikas, Brian William 2690 Balltown Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
Davidson, Paul Howard 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
03 /
Sander, Michael Frederick 2690 Balltown Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
04 /
Hoyt, Jacob Thomas 3348 Wyss Road Cazenovia, NY 13035 / US | |||
05 /
Welsh, Jason James 309 N. Owen Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | |||
06 /
Holmes, Kevin L. 5554 Babbit Road Portageville, NY 14536 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20170885.6 | 22.04.2020 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201916395849 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: US201916395849 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730783 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3730783 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F03D15/00, F03D80/50 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
F03D80/50 (EP,US);
F03D15/10 (US);
B23P6/00 (US);
B23P6/002 (US);
F03D15/00 (EP);
F16H57/021 (US);
F05B2230/61 (EP);
F05B2230/70 (US);
F05B2230/80 (EP,US);
F05B2240/916 (US);
F05B2260/30 (EP);
F05B2260/4031 (US);
F16H2057/0068 (US);
F16H2057/02078 (US);
F16H2057/0235 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINES GETRIEBES IN EINER WINDKRAFTANLAGE | [2022/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A GEARBOX OF A WIND TURBINE UPTOWER | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES INSTALLÉE DANS UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/44] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINES GETRIEBES EINES WINDTURBINENAUFSATZES | ||
Former [2020/44] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES D'UNE TOUR SUPÉRIEURE D'ÉOLIENNE | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 16.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2146090 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0040] , [0051] , [0053] * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP2808288 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0011] ** figure 11 *; | [A]DE102015119173 (EICKHOFF ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0019] * * figures 2-4 *; | [XI]CN108105041 (NANJING HIGH SPEED GEAR MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0016] , [0019] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 9,15 | Examination | DE102015119173 |