EP3748007 - GENE AUGMENTATION THERAPIES FOR INHERITED RETINAL DEGENERATION CAUSED BY MUTATIONS IN THE PRPF31 GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Eye & Ear Infirmary 243 Charles Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERCE, Eric A. 118 Goden Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
FARKAS, Michael H. 11 Sean Riley No.1 Getzville, NY 14053-1492 / US | 03 /
SOUSA, Maria E. 20 Fairfield Street Dedham, MA 02026 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 20171646.1 | 07.03.2016 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | US201562129638P | 06.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562129638 P | US201562147307P | 14.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562147307 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748007 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3748007 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/90, A61K9/00, A61K48/00, A61P27/02, // C12N15/113 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N15/90 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2800/22 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/14, C12N2310/531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GENAUGMENTATIONSTHERAPIEN FÜR HEREDITÄRE NETZHAUTDEGENERATION DURCH MUTATIONEN IM PRPF31-GEN | [2020/50] | English: | GENE AUGMENTATION THERAPIES FOR INHERITED RETINAL DEGENERATION CAUSED BY MUTATIONS IN THE PRPF31 GENE | [2020/50] | French: | THÉRAPIES D'AUGMENTATION GÉNÉTIQUE DE LA DÉGÉNÉRESCENCE RÉTINIENNE HÉRÉDITAIRE CAUSÉE PAR DES MUTATIONS AU NIVEAU DU GÈNE PRPF31 | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16762307.3 / EP3265568 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02082904 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [Y]WO2004084951 (UNIV NANTES [FR], et al); | [A]WO2008137066 (UNIV OKLAHOMA [US], et al); | [A]WO2009134681 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [A]WO2014011210 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [T]WO2015189429 (UNIV SANTIAGO COMPOSTELA [ES], et al); | by applicant | JP1047381 | EP0043075 | WO8902468 | WO8905345 | WO8907136 | US4868116 | US4980286 | WO9106309 | WO9207573 | WO2015054653 |