EP3753647 - IMPACT DRIVE FOR A LINEAR MOVING TOOL, AND METHOD FOR CUTTING A SHEET METAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/52] | IMPACT DRIVE FOR A LINEAR MOVING TOOL, SHEET METAL COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR CUTTING A SHEET METAL COMPONENT | ||
[2023/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH An der Talle 27-31 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabe, Frank Akazienweg 8 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | 02 /
Frost, Georg Frankenbergstraße 25 32839 Steinheim / DE | 03 /
Fortmeier, Herr Günter Birkenallee 9 33129 Delbrück / DE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20172386.3 | 30.04.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | DE201910116550 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019116550 | DE201910116968 | 24.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019116968 | [2020/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3753647 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3753647 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753647 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/24, B21D28/00, B25D9/02, B25D9/08 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
B25D9/02 (EP);
B21D28/002 (EP);
B21D28/24 (EP);
B25D9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | STOSSANTRIEB FÜR EIN LINEAR ZU BEWEGENDES WERKZEUG, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINES BLECHBAUTEILS | [2023/19] | English: | IMPACT DRIVE FOR A LINEAR MOVING TOOL, AND METHOD FOR CUTTING A SHEET METAL COMPONENT | [2023/19] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT PAR IMPACT POUR UN OUTIL À DÉPLACER LINÉAIREMENT, AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE D'UN COMPOSANT DE TÔLE | [2023/19] |
Former [2020/52] | STOSSANTRIEB FÜR EIN LINEAR ZU BEWEGENDES WERKZEUG, BLECHBAUTEIL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINES BLECHBAUTEILS | ||
Former [2020/52] | IMPACT DRIVE FOR A LINEAR MOVING TOOL, SHEET METAL COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR CUTTING A SHEET METAL COMPONENT | ||
Former [2020/52] | ENTRAÎNEMENT PAR IMPACT POUR UN OUTIL À DÉPLACER LINÉAIREMENT, COMPOSANT DE TÔLE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE D'UN COMPOSANT DE TÔLE | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 10.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5119667 (HOLLIS FREDDY C [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5,12 * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 38; figure 1 * [A] 4,6-11,14; | [A]DE102007054533 (HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECH [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009326425 (HEINE GEROLD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0075]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2013118766 (WATANABE YUKIO [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0051] , [0 72] - [0079]; figure 7 *; | [A]DE102016125510 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,14* claims 1-5 * | by applicant | DE20081000909 |