EP3734506 - AUTOMATED AUTHENTICATION REGION LOCALIZATION AND CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alitheon, Inc. 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ross, David Justin 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, WA Washington 98004 / US | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Herre, Peter, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 20172563.7 | 30.04.2020 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | US201962842444P | 02.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962842444 P | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734506 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/32, G06K9/03 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G06V10/993 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06V20/35 (US);
G06V20/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] |
Former [2020/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE LOKALISIERUNG UND ERFASSUNG VON AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSBEREICHEN | [2020/45] | English: | AUTOMATED AUTHENTICATION REGION LOCALIZATION AND CAPTURE | [2020/45] | French: | LOCALISATION ET CAPTURE AUTOMATIQUES D'UNE RÉGION D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9361507 (HOYOS HECTOR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 60 - column 26, line 27; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]US2017344824 (MARTIN BRIAN [US]) [X] 1,10-13,15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0078]; figures 1-7 * [I] 2-9,14; | [A]US2018047128 (ROSS DAVID JUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0127]; figures 1-12 * | by applicant | US9152862 | US9443298 | US2018144211 | US10037537 | US10346852 | - MISTRY, DARSHANA et al., "Comparison of Feature Detection and Matching Approaches: SIFT and SURF", GRD Journals- Global Research and Development Journal for Engineering I, (20170300), vol. 2 I, no. 4 I |