EP3747687 - ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIEG, Berengar Brennerstrasse 59 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
STIMM, Frank Ellwangerstr. 3 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
MANTEL, Regine Schwabstrasse 159 70193 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
FISCHER, Christoph Schwarenbergstrasse 83 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 20172873.0 | 05.05.2020 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | DE201910208280 | 06.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208280 | [2020/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747687 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60L50/50, B60L50/64, B60L50/60, B60L58/20, B60L58/22 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B60L50/50 (EP);
H02J7/007182 (US);
B60L50/64 (EP);
B60L50/66 (EP);
B60L58/20 (EP);
B60L58/22 (EP);
B60L2240/54 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETREIBEN | [2020/50] | English: | ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACCUMULATION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012139338 (KIM SUK HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0029] - [0037]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,5,9,10; | [Y]US2018281616 (KIM MI OK [KR], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] *; | [Y]EP3398818 (VOLVO CAR CORP [SE]) [Y] 3,5* paragraphs [0027] , [0034]; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE102015206523 | DE102016224618 |