EP3907862 - ELECTRIC DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO CAR CORPORATION 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHN, Joakim 405 31 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
SANDSTRÖM, Håkan 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20172926.6 | 05.05.2020 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907862 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/32, H02K7/00 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H02K1/32 (EP);
B60K11/02 (US);
B60K1/00 (US);
H02K5/203 (US);
H02K7/003 (EP,US);
H02K9/19 (US);
B60K2001/006 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER ANTRIEB | [2021/45] | English: | ELECTRIC DRIVE | [2021/45] | French: | COMMANDE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 07.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2003132673 (ZHOU SHIJIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,13-15 * Paragraphs 3, 15;; figures 1, 2 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 2,8-10; | [Y]EP1522749 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * figures 8,12 *; | [Y]EP2562914 (IHI CORP [JP]) [Y] 9* figure 5 *; | [XAY]DE102017214507 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,13,14 * Paragraph 33;; figures 1,2 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 2,8-10; | [XAY]JP2019216555 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,3-7,13,14 * figures 3,18 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 2,8-10; | [Y]US2020036248 (KRAIS NILS [DE], et al) [Y] 8,10 * figure 1 * |