EP3750589 - INTRAGASTRIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obalon Therapeutics, Inc. 5421 Avenue Encinas, Suite F Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRISTER, Mark, C. 1055 Valley Side Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
FAUCHER, Paul 1351 Condor Glen Escondido, CA 92029 / US | 03 /
DRAKE, Neil, R. 10880 Ivy Hill Drive, 7 San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 04 /
RASDAL, Andrew, P. 4736 Finchley Terrace San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
LAKE, Matthew, S. 2375 Caringa Way Apartment E Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 06 /
MARKOVIC, Dubravka c/o Obalon Therapeutics, Inc. 5421 Avenida Encinas, Suite F Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 07 /
VANDENBERG, Amy D. L. c/o Obalon Therapeutics, Inc. 5421 Avenida Encinas, Suite F Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | 08 /
LLEVARES, Antonio 1003 Plaza Gardenia Chula Vista, CA 91910 / US | 09 /
NIDER, Josefina 8851 Arcturus Way San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 20173156.9 | 15.03.2013 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750589 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00, A61M29/02, A61M25/10, A61M39/22, A61F5/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A61F5/0089 (EP,CN,US);
A61F5/0036 (EP,CN,US);
A61F5/003 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/10184 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/10182 (EP,US);
A61M25/10185 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/10187 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | INTRAGASTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/51] | English: | INTRAGASTRIC DEVICE | [2020/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTRAGASTRIQUE | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13877727.1 / EP2968879 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4489440 (CHAOUI SAMIR M [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * Figs. 1 and 2 // flow channel in control unit 10, air supply 16, main valve 30, switch 34, regulator 36, pressure compensation valve 40 * [I] 6,7; | [A]EP2095798 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4739758 (LAI N C JOSEPH [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4133315 | US5259399 | US5234454 | US6454785 | US4416267 | US4485805 | US4607618 | US4694827 | US4723547 | US4739758 | US4899747 | EP0246999 | US5129915 | US2010100116 |