EP3736054 - DEVICE FOR WASHING A DECORATION CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Power Group S.r.l. Via Cà del Miele 9 42013 Casalgrande / IT | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/46] | For all designated states Air Power Group S.p.A. Via Cà del Miele 9 42013 Casalgrande (Reggio Emilia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIGLIOLI, Ivano Air Power Group S.p.A. Via Ca' del Miele, 9 42013 Casalgrande / IT | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Ruzzu, Giammario Via Gulli, 5 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20173573.5 | 07.05.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | IT20190006615 | 07.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900006615 | [2020/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736054 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3736054 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
B08B3/024 (EP);
B05B14/41 (EP);
B05B16/95 (EP);
B05B9/0423 (EP);
B05B1/20 (EP);
B05B13/0221 (EP);
B05B13/0405 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM WASCHEN EINER CABINE VON DEKO | [2020/46] | English: | DEVICE FOR WASHING A DECORATION CABINET | [2020/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE D'UNE CABINE DE DÉCORATION | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 14.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 14.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE4301388 (RAUTARUUKKI OY [FI]) [I] 1-8 * figures 1-2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]ITMO20010034 (BONINI VILIO [IT]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]EP1566224 (AIR POWER GROUP S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US7320329 (LUKE STEPHEN A [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * figures 5-7; claims 1-11 * [I] 8; | [I]DE102014117371 (GUGGENBERGER REINIGUNGSTECHNIK E K [DE]) [I] 1,5-8 * figures 3-5; claims 1-9 *; | [XI]US2016175902 (SPEKSCHATE VINCENT P [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0037]; figure 5 * [I] 8; | [A]WO2016203299 (PROJECTA ENG S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claim 13 *; | [A]EP3238900 (AIR POWER GROUP S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [I]WO2018218120 (ECOSERV TECH LLC [US]) [I] 1,5,8 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figures 3-5 * |