EP3736777 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE DIGITAL FINGERPRINT OF VEHICLES IN TRANSIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinelec S.p.A. Strada Provinciale 211 della Lomellina, 3/13 Località San Guglielmo 15057 Tortona (AL) / IT | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONTEGNO, Pietro c/o SINELEC S.p.A., Strada Provinciale 211 della Lomellina, 3/13, Località San Guglielmo 15057 TORTONA (AL) / IT | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/46] | Cernuzzi, Daniele, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20173736.8 | 08.05.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | IT20190006648 | 08.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900006648 | [2020/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736777 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/06, // G08G1/017 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G08G1/0175 (EP);
G06F17/00 (BR);
G06V20/54 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
G08G1/0112 (EP);
G08G1/0116 (EP);
G08G1/0129 (EP);
G08G1/015 (EP);
G08G1/017 (US);
G08G1/04 (EP);
H04L65/40 (BR);
H04W4/40 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
G06V20/625 (US);
G06V2201/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES DIGITALEN FINGERABDRUCKS VON FAHRZEUGEN IM TRANSIT | [2020/46] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE DIGITAL FINGERPRINT OF VEHICLES IN TRANSIT | [2020/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LES EMPREINTES DIGITALES NUMÉRIQUES DE VÉHICULES EN TRANSIT | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2266398 (TRAFFIC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED [GB]) [A] 6-8,17-19* page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 14 *; | [XI]WO9428516 (SAAB SCANIA COMBITECH AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,5,9-11,15,16,20,21 * claim 1 * * figures 1-2 * * page 3, line 6 - line 36 * * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 31 * [I] 2-4,6-8,12-14,17-19; | [XI]EP2518695 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE]) [X] 1-4,9-14,16,20,21 * claims 1-6 * * figures 9A, 9B * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0139] * [I] 6-8,15,17-19 |