EP3834946 - WATERWAY SWITCHING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiamen Solex High-Tech Industries Co., Ltd. Room A06, 4th Floor No. 18, Haijing Road East Xiamen Area of China (Fujian) Pilot Free Trade Zone 361022 Xiamen, Fujian / CN | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Fengde XIAMEN SOLEX HIGH-TECH INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. Room A06, 4th Floor No. 18, Haijing Road East Xiamen Area of China (Fujian), Pilot Free Trade Zone Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Wenxing XIAMEN SOLEX HIGH-TECH INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. Room A06, 4th Floor No. 18, Haijing Road East Xiamen Area of China (Fujian), Pilot Free Trade Zone Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Donghai XIAMEN SOLEX HIGH-TECH INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. Room A06, 4th Floor No. 18, Haijing Road East Xiamen Area of China (Fujian), Pilot Free Trade Zone Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Bin XIAMEN SOLEX HIGH-TECH INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. Room A06, 4th Floor No. 18, Haijing Road East Xiamen Area of China (Fujian), Pilot Free Trade Zone Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2021/24] | Hamel, Armin Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20173737.6 | 08.05.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | CN201910379860 | 08.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910379860 | CN201911167484 | 25.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911167484 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834946 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/18, B05B1/16, B05B12/00 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
B05B1/18 (EP,US);
B05B1/1636 (EP);
B05B1/1654 (US);
B05B1/1663 (EP);
B05B1/1681 (US);
B05B1/3086 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERWEG-UMSCHALTMECHANISMUS | [2021/24] | English: | WATERWAY SWITCHING MECHANISM | [2021/24] | French: | MÉCANISME DE COMMUTATION DE VOIE D'EAU | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 16.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CN202427568U (RUNNER XIAMEN IND CORP) [AD] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2013284823 (ZHOU HUASONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** paragraph [0060] *; | [A]EP3095523 (XIAMEN RUNNER IND CORP [CN]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0027] *; | [X]EP3162446 (SINYU TECH (FUJIAN) CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,3,9,15,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027] * | by applicant | CN202427568U |