EP3909918 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE ELECTROSTATIC SEPARATION OF POLYMER PARTICLES FROM WASTE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/46] | METHOD FOR THE ELECTROSTATIC SEPARATION OF POLYMER PARTICLES FROM WASTE WATER | ||
[2023/41] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENNER, Patrik 63452 Hanau / DE | 02 /
TECLE, Yikalo-Eyob 63065 Offenbach / DE | 03 /
HOCH, Dr., Sascha 44797 Bochum / DE | 04 /
VOGEL, Prof., Nicolas 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20174119.6 | 12.05.2020 | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909918 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909918 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/463, C02F1/68, // C02F1/461, C02F101/30, C02F1/66 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
C02F1/463 (EP);
C02F1/68 (EP);
C02F1/46114 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP);
C02F2001/46123 (EP);
C02F2001/46138 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROSTATISCHEN ABSCHEIDUNG VON POLYMERPARTIKELN AUS ABWÄSSERN | [2023/41] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE ELECTROSTATIC SEPARATION OF POLYMER PARTICLES FROM WASTE WATER | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION ÉLECTROSTATIQUE DES PARTICULES POLYMÈRES D'EAUX USÉES | [2023/41] |
Former [2021/46] | VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROSTATISCHEN ABSCHEIDUNG VON POLYMERPARTIKELN AUS ABWÄSSERN | ||
Former [2021/46] | METHOD FOR THE ELECTROSTATIC SEPARATION OF POLYMER PARTICLES FROM WASTE WATER | ||
Former [2021/46] | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION ÉLECTROSTATIQUE DES PARTICULES POLYMÈRES D'EAUX USÉES | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 20.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 24.01.2024 | |
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 24.01.2024 | |
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 24.04.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 24.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE4102238 (UNIV CHEMNITZ TECH [DE]) [I] 1-12 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 37 *; | [IA]JP2005087789 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0064] *[A] 9-12; | [IA]CN104710063 (CHINA NAT OFFSHORE OIL CORP, et al) [I] 1-8 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0041] * [A] 9-12 |