EP3909940 - METHOD FOR THE OLIGOMERISATION OF OLEFINS WITH CONTROL OF THE CONTENT OF OLIGOMERS IN HYDROCARBON STREAMS TO BE OLIGOMERISED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Oxeno GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stochniol, Guido 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 02 /
Peitz, Stephan 45739 Oer-Erkenschwick / DE | 03 /
Nadolny, Fabian 04157 Leipzig / DE | 04 /
Berntsson, Benjamin William 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
Reeker, Helene 44227 Dortmund / DE | 06 /
Bukohl, Reiner 45770 Marl / DE | 07 /
Paul, Niklas 45770 Marl / DE | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20174314.3 | 13.05.2020 | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909940 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909940 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/10, C07C7/04, C07C11/02, C10G50/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
C07C2/10 (EP);
C07C7/04 (EP);
C10G50/00 (EP);
C07C2521/12 (EP);
C07C2523/755 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/10, C07C11/02 (EP);
C07C7/04, C07C11/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OLIGOMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINEN MIT KONTROLLE DES GEHALTS AN OLIGOMEREN IN DEN ZU OLIGOMERISIERENDEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFSTRÖMEN | [2021/46] | English: | METHOD FOR THE OLIGOMERISATION OF OLEFINS WITH CONTROL OF THE CONTENT OF OLIGOMERS IN HYDROCARBON STREAMS TO BE OLIGOMERISED | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OLIGOMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES À CONTRÔLE DE LA TENEUR EN OLIGOMÈRES DANS LES FLUX D'HYDROCARBURES À OLIGOMÉRISER | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 30.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | IE | 13.05.2023 | LU | 13.05.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 13.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 13.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 13.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 22.02.2023 | |
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.02.2023 | |
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1457475 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figure -; example - *; | [AD]WO2011000697 (EVONIK OXENO GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-13* example -; claim - * | by applicant | WO2011000697 |