EP3741591 - TYRE-CHANGING MACHINE, PARTICULARLY FOR LARGE WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Devel S.r.l. Via Sacco e Vanzetti 3 41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonetti, Valentino c/o DEVEL S.r.l. Via Sacco e Vanzetti, 3 41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 20175400.9 | 19.05.2020 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | IT20190007034 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900007034 | [2020/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741591 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60C25/05, B60C25/138 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
B60C25/138 (EP);
B60C25/0518 (EP);
B60C25/0521 (EP);
B60C25/0548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENWECHSELMASCHINE, SPEZIELL FÜR GROSSE REIFEN | [2020/48] | English: | TYRE-CHANGING MACHINE, PARTICULARLY FOR LARGE WHEELS | [2020/48] | French: | MACHINE À CHANGER LES PNEUS, EN PARTICULIER POUR LES GRANDES ROUES | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/44] | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1040941 (BUTLER ENG & MARKETING [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 13] , [0014] , [0021] , [0033] - [0036]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0042363 (GS SRL [IT]) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4606393 (CUCCOLINI MARIA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1052120 (GIULIANO SRL [IT]) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPH09123717 (ONODANI KIKO KK) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1364814 (BUTLER ENG & MARKETING [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 15] - [0025]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP1623850 |