EP3741613 - SEAT RECLINER FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Transys Inc. 105, Sindang 1-ro Seongyeon-myeon Seosan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31930 / KR | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Seung Hun 211-1008, Sinyeongtong Hyundai Apt., Banwol-dong Hwaseong-si 18376 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20175428.0 | 19.05.2020 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | KR20190061469 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190061469 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741613 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/225 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
B60N2/2252 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/225 (CN);
B60N2/2254 (KR,US);
B60N2/235 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZLEHNENVERSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/48] | English: | SEAT RECLINER FOR VEHICLE | [2020/48] | French: | APPAREIL D'INCLINAISON POUR VÉHICULE | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 25.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202005021118U (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]KR20170141334 (SEOYONCNF [KR]) |