EP3744434 - SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Dempa Kogyo Co., Ltd. 1-47-1, Sasazuka Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8569 / JP | For all designated states Japan Aerospace Exploration Agency 7-44-1 Jindaiji Higashimachi Chofu-shi Tokyo 182-8522 / JP | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUKITA, Hiroyuki c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose Sayama-shi, Saitama 350-1321 / JP | 02 /
SHIOBARA, Tsuyoshi c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose Sayama-shi, Saitama 350-1321 / JP | 03 /
YANAGISAWA, Yuki c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose Sayama-shi, Saitama 350-1321 / JP | 04 /
NAKAGAWA, Shohei c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose Sayama-shi, Saitama 350-1321 / JP | 05 /
MIYAZAKI, Eiji c/o JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION AGENCY 7-44-1, Jindaiji, Higashimachi Chofu-shi, Tokyo 182-8522 / JP | 06 /
TSUCHIYA, Yuta c/o JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION AGENCY 7-44-1, Jindaiji, Higashimachi Chofu-shi, Tokyo 182-8522 / JP | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/49] | 01 /
KUKITA, Hiroyuki c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose, Sayama-shi Saitama, 350-1321 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIOBARA, Tsuyoshi c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose, Sayama-shi Saitama, 350-1321 / JP | |||
03 /
YANAGISAWA, Yuki c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose, Sayama-shi Saitama, 350-1321 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAGAWA, Shohei c/o NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO., LTD., Sayama Plant 1275-2, Oaza Kamihirose, Sayama-shi Saitama, 350-1321 / JP | |||
05 /
MIYAZAKI, Eiji c/o JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION AGENCY 7-44-1, Jindaiji, Higashimachi, Chofu-shi Tokyo, 182-8522 / JP | |||
06 /
TSUCHIYA, Yuta c/o JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION AGENCY 7-44-1, Jindaiji, Higashimachi, Chofu-shi Tokyo, 182-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/49] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20175719.2 | 20.05.2020 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | JP20190098699 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019098699 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744434 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744434 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, G01N29/22, G01N29/24, H04R17/00, H01L41/053, H01L41/083, H01L41/113, H01L23/40 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
G01H11/08 (EP);
G01H13/00 (EP);
G01N29/036 (EP,US);
G01N29/22 (EP);
G01N29/2437 (EP);
G01N29/32 (US);
G01N29/326 (EP);
G01N2291/014 (US);
G01N2291/021 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0255 (EP);
G01N2291/0256 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SENSORVORRICHTUNG | [2020/49] | English: | SENSING DEVICE | [2020/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 26.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5579205 (TUSTANIWSKYJ JERRY I [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 8-16, 38-41 *; | [YD]JP2005257394 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [YD] 1,4-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010200206 (MANDRONE CARLO [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] *; | [Y]US2010322280 (KWON SU YONG [KR], et al) [Y] 1,4-10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0028]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2016211191 (TAN RUI SHENG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0003] *; | [Y]WO2018087957 (NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2005257394 |