EP3761593 - PERMISSION BASED RESOURCE AND SERVICE DISCOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Convida Wireless, LLC 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEED, Dale N. Convida Wireless, LLC 229 N. 36th Street Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US | 02 /
FLYNN, William Robert IV Convida Wireless, LLC 451 Mayberry Road Schwenksville, Pennsylvania 19473 / US | 03 /
LY, Quang Convida Wireless, LLC 115 Sterling Drive North Wales, Pennsylvania 19454 / US | 04 /
FLECK, Donald A. Convida Wireless, LLC 870 Frank Drive Emmaus, Pennsylvania 18049 / US | 05 /
GORMAN, Richard P. Convida Wireless, LLC 150 Grasshopper Drive Ivyland, Pennsylvania 18974 / US | 06 /
PODIAS, Nicholas J. Convida Wireless, LLC 164 87th Street Brooklyn, New York 11209 / US | 07 /
STARSINIC, Michael F. Convida Wireless, LLC 190 Andrew Drive Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 08 /
LI, Hongkun Convida Wireless, LLC 107 Forge Court Malvern, Pennsylvania 19355 / US | 09 /
CHEN, Zhuo Convida Wireless, LLC 1397 Parish Avenue Claymont, Delaware 19703 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20175910.7 | 13.11.2015 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201462079972P | 14.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462079972 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761593 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3761593 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/08, H04W4/70, H04L9/40, H04L67/51, H04W4/02 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04L63/105 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L63/102 (US);
H04L63/101 (US);
H04L63/166 (US);
H04L67/51 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04L41/0273 (US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (US);
H04W12/63 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W12/08, H04W4/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | ERLAUBNISBASIERTE RESSOURCEN- UND DIENSTENTDECKUNG | [2021/01] | English: | PERMISSION BASED RESOURCE AND SERVICE DISCOVERY | [2021/01] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE DE RESSOURCES ET DE SERVICES BASÉE SUR DES AUTORISATIONS | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 02.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15798652.2 / EP3219075 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | DK | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | ES | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | IT | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | MC | 01.02.2023 | PL | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SE | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | NO | 01.05.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
IT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
ES | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
NO | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.02.2023 | |
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.02.2023 | |
LT | 01.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2014221032 (YANG JEONG-YEOP [KR]) [X] 1,4,10,13-15 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0072]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0130]; figure 8 *[A] 2,3,5-9,11,12 |