EP3786278 - IDENTIFICATION OF CALIBRATION DEVIATIONS OF PH-MEASURING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGER, Christian c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | 02 /
GREPPMAIER, Katrin 82377 Penzberg / DE | 03 /
EISENKRAETZER, Detlef 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2022/12] |
Former [2021/09] | 01 /
KLINGER, Christian c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | ||
02 /
GREPPMAIR, Katrin Sophie Scholl Strasse 18 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
03 /
EISENKRAETZER, Detlef Erlenweg 14 82393 Iffeldorf / DE | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 20176613.6 | 28.10.2016 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | EP20150192389 | 30.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15192389 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786278 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3786278 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, G01N27/416 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C12M41/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12M41/36 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12M41/34 (IL,KR);
C12M41/48 (IL,KR);
G01D18/008 (IL,US);
G01N27/4165 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G05D21/02 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON KALIBRIERUNGSABWEICHUNGEN VON PH-MESSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/17] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF CALIBRATION DEVIATIONS OF PH-MEASURING DEVICES | [2021/09] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE DÉVIATIONS D'ÉTALONNAGE DE DISPOSITIFS DE MESURE DU PH | [2021/09] |
Former [2021/09] | IDENTIFIZIERUNG DER KALIBRIERUNG VON ABWEICHUNGEN VON PH-MESSVORRICHTUNGEN | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 03.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16790330.1 / EP3368653 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2016 | AL | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | LU | 28.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006155511 (STEINMUELLER DIRK [DE], et al); | [A]WO2007085880 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al); | [A]JP2013019804 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US2014330398 (FAN SHUN JIE [CN], et al); |