EP3915646 - FAN DEVICE FOR A RESPIRATORY PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optrel Holding AG Industriestrasse 2 9630 Wattwil / CH | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUSSER, Jonathan 8713 Uerikon / CH | 02 /
BUECHEL, Robert 9630 Wattwil / CH | 03 /
BLÖCHLINGER, Daniel 8735 St. Gallenkappel / CH | 04 /
BROUWER, Jasper 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20176882.7 | 27.05.2020 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915646 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/08, A62B9/04, F04D25/06, F04D25/08, // A62B7/12 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
A62B9/04 (EP);
A62B18/006 (EP);
A62B18/08 (EP);
F04D17/16 (EP);
F04D25/0673 (EP);
F04D25/08 (EP);
A62B7/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBLÄSEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ATEMSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2021/48] | English: | FAN DEVICE FOR A RESPIRATORY PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2021/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF VENTILATEUR POUR UN SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION RESPIRATOIRE | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3139198 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 ** column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 20 *; | [XYI]WO9841306 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 4, lines 1-25 * * page 5, lines 9-17 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-8 [I] 4; | [Y]KR20100048283 (YOO YEONG MIN [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP3111997 (SCOTT HEALTH & SAFETY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0064] * * figures 1, 5a * |